EP1972107 - PROTECTION OR CONTROL-SYSTEM APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGA, Clemens Paniersplatz 13 90403 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
LANG, Gerhard Vogelweide 15 14557 Wilhelmshorst / DE | 03 /
NEUMANN, Götz Geitelsteig 7 13627 Berlin / DE | [2008/39] | Application number, filing date | 06722727.2 | 29.03.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006DE00576 | Priority number, date | WO2006DE00052 | 12.01.2006 Original published format: PCT/DE2006/000052 | WO2006DE00179 | 01.02.2006 Original published format: PCT/DE2006/000179 | [2008/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007079703 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972107 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1972107 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
G01R31/2827 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZ- ODER LEITTECHNIKGERÄT | [2008/39] | English: | PROTECTION OR CONTROL-SYSTEM APPLIANCE | [2008/39] | French: | APPAREIL DE PROTECTION OU DE COMMANDE | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | IE | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | NL | 26.05.2010 | PL | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SE | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | SK | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | ES | 06.09.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | CZ | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CZ | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | DK | 26.05.2010 | |
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | FI | 26.05.2010 | |
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004030284 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 4 * the whole document * * page 12, line 35 - page 14, line 1 *; | [A]US2004252682 (BRUECKNER DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 4* paragraphs [0065] , [0087] *; | [A]US2005169262 (KASPER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 4 * paragraph [0036]; figure 1; claim 12 *; | [X]US2005254490 (GALLATIN TOM [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-11 * paragraphs [0009] , [0073] - [0093] * * paragraphs [0168] - [0175] * | by applicant | DE10260806 | US2005254490 |