EP1869952 - STARTER AUXILIARY ELECTRODE STARTING DEVICE WITH AN ARC GAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIESSEGGER, Bernhard Wirtstr. 15 81539 München / DE | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Raiser, Franz OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Raiser, Franz Osram GmbH Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06722789.2 | 12.04.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006DE00657 | Priority number, date | EP20050008228 | 14.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05008228 | DE20051023798 | 19.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005023798 | [2007/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006108407 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1869952 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/00 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
H05B41/2881 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, HU, IT [2008/30] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZÜNDHILFSELEKTRODEZÜNDVORRICHTUNG MIT FUNKENSTRECKE | [2007/52] | English: | STARTER AUXILIARY ELECTRODE STARTING DEVICE WITH AN ARC GAP | [2007/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALLUMAGE D'ELECTRODE AUXILIAIRE D'ALLUMAGE A ECLATEUR | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB760674 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 10; figure 1x *; | [X]GB640156 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-13 * page 2, line 37 - line 102 *; | [A]US6445129 (SEILER HARTMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 16 *; | [A]EP1381126 (DEHN & SOEHNE [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |