EP1865846 - PIERCING SYSTEM FOR REMOVING A BODILY FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2015/33] |
Former [2007/51] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECK, Frank Triftweg 1 67150 Niederkirchen / DE | 02 /
QUARDER, Ortrud Zähringerstr. 61 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
WEISS, Thomas Obergasse 42 68307 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
HÖRAUF, Christian In den Auwiesen 53 68723 Oftersheim / DE | 05 /
KEIL, Michael Richinesstr. 22a 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
KONYA, Ahmet Lerchenstr. 80 67165 Waldsee / DE | 07 /
HARTTIG, Herbert Dochnahlstrasse 14 67434 Neustadt / DE | 08 /
BAADER, Felix Im Aespliz 2 CH-3063 Ittingen / CH | 09 /
LIST, Hans Siegfriedstrasse 27 64754 Hesseneck-Kailbach / DE | 10 /
EBERT, Karl-Peter Erbacher Str. 12 64407 Fränkisch-Crumbach / DE | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
DECK, Frank Triftweg 1 67150 Niederkirchen / DE | ||
02 /
QUARDER, Ortrud Zähringerstr. 61 69115 Heidelberg / DE | |||
03 /
WEISS, Thomas Obergasse 42 68307 Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
HÖRAUF, Christian In den Auwiesen 53 68723 Oftersheim / DE | |||
05 /
KISTNER, Michael Richinesstr. 22a 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
06 /
KONYA, Ahmet Sandhofer Str. 31 68307 Mannheim / DE | |||
07 /
HARTTIG, Herbert Dochnahlstrasse 14 67434 Neustadt / DE | |||
08 /
BAADER, Felix Im Aespliz 2 CH-3063 Ittingen / CH | |||
09 /
LIST, Hans Siegfriedstrasse 27 64754 Hesseneck-Kailbach / DE | |||
10 /
EBERT, Karl-Peter Erbacher Str. 12 64407 Fränkisch-Crumbach / DE | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, et al Durm & Partner Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [2008/48] |
Former [2007/51] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, et al Durm & Partner Patentanwälte Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 06723174.6 | 02.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006EP01922 | Priority number, date | DE20051009652 | 03.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005009652 | EP20050027429 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: EP 05027429 | [2007/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006092309 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1865846 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865846 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/151 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
A61B5/15148 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/15019 (EP,US);
A61B5/150198 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150572 (EP,US);
A61B5/150832 (EP,US);
A61B5/150916 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
A61B5/15128 (EP,US);
A61B5/1519 (EP,US);
A61B5/15194 (EP,US);
A61B5/15196 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STECHSYSTEM ZUR ENTNAHME EINER KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2007/51] | English: | PIERCING SYSTEM FOR REMOVING A BODILY FLUID | [2007/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE PIQURE DESTINE AU PRELEVEMENT D'UN LIQUIDE ORGANIQUE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2006 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | AT | 02.03.2016 | GB | 02.03.2016 | IE | 02.03.2016 | LU | 02.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | FR | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 02.03.2006 | |
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
GB | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.03.2006 | |
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
GB | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
GB | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
GB | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
GB | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004260325 (KUHR HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-11,18,22,25,27-31 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-7 * * the whole document * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]US2003083685 (FREEMAN DOMINIQUE M [US], et al) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0203]; figures 29-42,52,56 * * paragraph [0233] *; | [A]US2003199892 (KIM YONG PIL [KR]) [A] 4 * paragraphs [0018] - [0028]; figures 1-4 * | Examination | US2004127818 | US4895147 | by applicant | US2004127818 |