EP1863978 - CHANNEL BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACO SEVERIN AHLMANN GMBH & CO. KG Am Ahlmannkai 24768 Rendsburg / DE | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANNEY, James 231 Castle Road Bedford, Bedfordshire MK40 3UB / GB | 02 /
OLSEN, Hans Strædet 32 DK-4600 Ko̸ge / DK | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06723354.4 | 10.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006EP02241 | Priority number, date | DE20051012146 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005012146 | [2007/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006097249 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1863978 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1863978 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03F3/04 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
E03F3/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RINNENKÖRPER | [2007/50] | English: | CHANNEL BODY | [2007/50] | French: | CORPS DE RIGOLE | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.05.2010 | CZ | 19.05.2010 | DK | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | IE | 19.05.2010 | LT | 19.05.2010 | LV | 19.05.2010 | NL | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SE | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | ES | 30.08.2010 | IS | 19.09.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.08.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.08.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
LT | 19.05.2010 | ||
LV | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH1088650 ; | [X]DE4327659 (AHLMANN ACO SEVERIN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 48 * * figure - *; | [A]US5518336 (ARM WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 15,30 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 7 ** figures 18-21 *; | [XA]US5529436 (MEYERS THEODORE W [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-14,16-24,26-29 * column 3, line 42 - column 9, line 49 * * figures 1-10 * [A] 3; | [X]WO0058560 (ETEX DE RECH TECH S E R T SOC [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-16,20,22-24,26-30 * page 14, line 12 - page 16, line 6 * * page 19, line 33 - page 23, line 13 * * figures 1-4,12-19 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10088650 A 19980407 (DAIWA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,12,13,16 * abstract * |