EP1861663 - LATENT HEAT STORAGE FOR EFFICIENT COOLING AND HEATING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAE Bayern Bayerisches Zentrum für angewandte Energieforschung e.V. Walther-Meissner-Strasse 6 85748 Garching / DE | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHLING, Harald Feilitschstrasse 33 Rgb. 80802 München / DE | 02 /
SCHWEIGLER, Christian Rainerstrasse 23 82178 Puchheim / DE | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06723606.7 | 21.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006EP02606 | Priority number, date | DE20051013012 | 21.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005013012 | [2007/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006100047 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1861663 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861663 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F25B29/00, F25B27/00, F28D20/02 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
F24F5/0021 (EP);
F24D11/0221 (EP);
F24F5/0046 (EP);
F25B27/002 (EP);
F28D20/02 (EP);
F25B2400/24 (EP);
F25D17/02 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02B10/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LATENTWÄRMESPEICHER FÜR EFFIZIENTE KÜHL- UND HEIZSYSTEME | [2007/49] | English: | LATENT HEAT STORAGE FOR EFFICIENT COOLING AND HEATING SYSTEMS | [2007/49] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR DE CHALEUR LATENTE POUR SYSTEMES DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET DE CHAUFFAGE PERFORMANTS | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2006 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | IE | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | AT | 21.03.2012 | LU | 21.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
AT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LU | 21.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
AT | 21.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
AT | 21.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4169554 (CAMP ELDON D [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 12 - page 7, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]US4205529 (KO SUK M [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE3233649 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 20, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9600370 (STORE HEAT & PRODUCE ENERGY INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 25 - page 37, line 2; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5507337 (RAFALOVICH ALEXANDER P [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 38 - page 17, line 60; figures 1,2 * |