EP1863860 - BIODEGRADABLE ALIPHATIC-AROMATIC COPOLYESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVAMONT S.p.A. Via G. Fauser, 8 28100 Novara / IT | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLORIDI, Giovanni Via della Noce, 63 I-28100 Novara / IT | 02 /
MILIZIA, Tiziana Via 13 Martiri, 8 I-28100 Novara / IT | 03 /
BASTIOLI, Catia Via 13 Martiri, 8 I-28100 Novara / IT | 04 /
TOSIN, Maurizio Via Monte Nero, 8 I-28887 Omegna (VB) / IT | 05 /
CELLA, Gian, Domenico Via Minghetti, 1/3 I-28100 Novara / IT | 06 /
SCAFFIDI LALLARO, Andrea Via San Giacomo, 6 I-13037 Serravalle Sesia / IT | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/50] | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06723662.0 | 17.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006EP02672 | Priority number, date | IT2005MI00452 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: IT MI20050452 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006097354 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1863860 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1863860 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C08G63/16 (EP,NO,US);
C08G63/183 (KR,NO);
C08G63/00 (KR);
C08G63/91 (KR);
C08G67/02 (NO);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L1/00 (EP,US);
C08L3/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1331 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/29 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARER ALIPHATISCH AROMATISCHER COPOLYESTER | [2007/50] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE ALIPHATIC-AROMATIC COPOLYESTER | [2007/50] | French: | POLYESTER AROMATIQUE-ALIPHATIQUE BIODEGRADABLE | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2008 | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | LT | 08.10.2008 | LV | 08.10.2008 | RO | 08.10.2008 | SI | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | IS | 08.02.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | IE | 17.03.2009 | LU | 17.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/22] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 17.03.2009 | ||
LU | 17.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 17.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 17.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 08.10.2008 | |
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 08.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4398022 (SUBLETT BOBBY J) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 48; examples 1-11 *; | [DX]DE19508737 (BIOTECHNOLOG FORSCHUNG GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-15 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 51; claims 1-8; tables 1,2 *; | [DY]US5559171 (BUCHANAN CHARLES M [US], et al) [DY] 1-15 * column 8, line 41 - column 12, line 31 *; | [Y]EP0950678 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 8, paragraph 44 - paragraph 45; examples 1-17; table 1 ** page 7, paragraph 29 - paragraph 32 * |