EP1893016 - WATER-IN-OIL SUSPOEMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience Aktiengesellschaft Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [2018/31] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRISCH, Gerhard Westerwaldstrasse 7 61273 Wehrheim / DE | 02 /
EBERSOLD, Ulrike Feldbergstrasse 32 65795 Hattersheim / DE | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/37] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 06724001.0 | 04.04.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006EP03044 | Priority number, date | EP20050009156 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05009156 | [2008/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006114186 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1893016 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893016 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/04, A01N25/02, A01N43/56, A01N25/30, A01N43/76, A01N37/40, A01N25/32 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
A01N25/02 (EP,US);
A01N25/04 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WASSER-IN-ÖL SUSPOEMULSIONEN | [2008/10] | English: | WATER-IN-OIL SUSPOEMULSIONS | [2008/10] | French: | SUSPOÉMULSIONS EAU-DANS-HUILE | [2017/17] |
Former [2008/10] | SUSPOEMULSIONS EAU DANS L'HUILE | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2006 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | AT | 04.04.2018 | IE | 04.04.2018 | LU | 04.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.04.2006 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0514769 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * page 1, line 1 - line 45 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 36; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9940784 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 1 - page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 8; claim - *; | [A]WO0007444 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1 - page 2, line 25 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 9; examples 1,2 *; | [X]WO0130156 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [X] 14-20 * page 1 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 27 - page 28; tables 1,2 *; | [A]WO03043422 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 1 ** page 13, paragraph 4; tables 1,3,4 * |