EP1865862 - PEDICLE SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer GmbH Sulzer Allee 8 8404 Winterthur / CH | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASUTT, Simon Bischofszellerstrasse 44 CH-9200 Gossau / CH | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06724014.3 | 04.04.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006EP03059 | Priority number, date | EP20050007292 | 04.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05007292 | [2007/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006105935 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865862 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865862 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70, A61B17/86 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/7001 (EP,US);
A61B17/863 (EP,US);
A61B17/7008 (EP,US);
A61B17/7031 (EP,US);
A61B17/864 (EP,US);
A61B17/8685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PEDIKELSCHRAUBE | [2007/51] | English: | PEDICLE SCREW | [2007/51] | French: | VIS PÉDICULAIRE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2006 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | IT | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | IS | 24.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | AT | 04.04.2017 | GB | 04.04.2017 | IE | 04.04.2017 | LU | 04.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | FR | 02.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.04.2006 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
AT | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.04.2006 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
AT | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.04.2006 | |
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
AT | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
AT | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1273269 (MUECKTER HELMUT DR MED DIPL-IN [DE], et al) [X] 1-21,24,28-36 * column 2, paragraphs 8-10 * * column 3, paragraphs 15,16 * * column 5, paragraph 25 - column 7, paragraph 31 * * column 8, paragraph 37 * * figures 1-7,13 * [Y] 26,27; | [XA]US6656184 (WHITE JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,12-17,20-24,28,29,31,34 * column 1, lines 14-60 * * column 4, lines 14-55 * * claim 3 * * figure 1 * [A] 39; | [XA]US2005055025 (ZACOUTO FRED [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12-16,18,19,30,35,36 * column 12, paragraph 252 - column 13, paragraph 260 * * figures 3-6 * [A] 39; | [XAY]WO0154598 (DISC O TECH MEDICAL TECH LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,15-17,20,29,31,35 * page 1, lines 15-22 * * page 5, lines 12-17 * * page 10, line 8 - page 13, line 23 * * figure 1 * [A] 12 [Y] 39,40; | [YA]US6206882 (COHEN HERB [US]) [Y] 26,27 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 44 * * figures 1-4,7,8 * [A] 1; | [YA]EP0669109 (SULZER MEDIZINALTECHNIK AG [CH], et al) [Y] 39,40 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 26 * * figures 2-7 * [A] 1; | [PX]WO2005065374 (SPINE WAVE INC [US]) [PX] 1-21,26-31,33-36,39 * page 4, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 22, paragraph 5 - page 23, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3,7-8B,10,11 *; | [PX]WO2005041793 (CRAGG ANDREW L [US], et al) [PX] 1-18,20,21,24,28-31,34-36 * page 19, lines 18-31 * * page 21, lines 11-23 * * page 29, lines 1-14 * * page 34, lines 22-32 * * page 47, lines 1-18 * * page 59, line 29 - page 60, line 7 * * figures 1-8,14,16,18 * |