EP1871787 - POLYMYXIN B ANALOGS FOR LPS DETOXIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69367 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | For all designated states BIOSYNTH Zona Industriale Localitá Sentino 53040 Repolano Terme / IT | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORRO, Massimo Via Selvapiana, 97 I-53040 Rapolano Terme-Siena / IT | 02 /
KRELL, Tino Andres Segovia 24 E-18198 Huetor Vega / ES | 03 /
MISTRETTA, Noëlle Chemin de Beaulieu F-69210 Saint Bel / FR | 04 /
MOREAU, Monique 324, rue Garibaldi F-69007 Lyon / FR | 05 /
RUSTICI, Alessandro Via Raffaello Sanzio 24 I-53018 Sovicille / IT | 06 /
VELUCCHI, Massimo Via Riovecchio 1191 I-52044 Cortona / IT | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Holtz, Béatrice, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Holtz, Béatrice, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/01] | Ayroles, Marie-Pauline, et al Sanofi Pasteur Propriété Intellectuelle 2, avenue pont Pasteur 69367 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06724173.7 | 10.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006EP03237 | Priority number, date | EP20050300270 | 11.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05300270 | EP20050300319 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05300319 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006108586 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1871787 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, A61K38/10, A61K38/16, C07K14/195 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP);
C07K7/00 (KR);
A61K47/62 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
C07K5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMYXIN-B-ANALOGA ZUR LPS-DETOXIFIZIERUNG | [2008/01] | English: | POLYMYXIN B ANALOGS FOR LPS DETOXIFICATION | [2008/01] | French: | ANALOGUES B DE POLYMYXINE DESTINES A LA DETOXIFICATION LPS | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 13.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/14] | Appeal following examination | 10.04.2009 | Appeal received | 19.06.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.07.2009 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9314115 (PORRO MASSIMO [IT]) [A] 1-32 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2004052394 (BIOSYNTH SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 1-32 * claim 2 *; | [Y] - RUSTICI A ET AL, "MOLECULAR MAPPING AND DETOXIFICATION OF THE LIPID A BINDING SITE BYSYNTHETIC PEPTIDES", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19930115), vol. 259, no. 5093, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 361 - 365, XP000608499 [Y] 1-32 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8420003 | [Y] - DEMITRI M T ET AL, "INHIBITION OF LPS-INDUCED SYSTEMIC AND LOCAL TNF PRODUCTION BY A SYNTHETIC ANTI-ENDOTOXIN PEPTIDE (SAEP-2)", JOURNAL OF ENDOTOXIN RESEARCH, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, EDINBURGH, GB, (199612), vol. 3, no. 6, ISSN 0968-0519, pages 445 - 454, XP009001817 [Y] 1-32 * page 446 * |