EP1882360 - REMOTE CONTROL APPARATUS FOR CONSUMER ELECTRONIC APPLIANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FotoNation Limited Cliona, Building 1 Parkmore East Business Park Ballybrit, Galway / IE | [2014/35] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states DigitalOptics Corporation Europe Limited Galway Business Park Dangan Galway City Galway / IE | ||
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Tessera Technologies Ireland Limited Cliona, Building One Parkmore East Business Park Ballybrit Galway / IE | ||
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states Fotonation Vision Limited Galway Business Park Dangan, Galway / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBERG, Eran 137 Granville Way San Francisco CA 94127 / US | 02 /
MEHRA, Sumat 7/104 Swarcop Nagar Kapur 208 002 (UP) / IN | 03 /
PETRONEL, Bigioi 57 Sceilg Ard Headford Road County Galway / IE | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Boyce, Conor Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Boyce, Conor Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2013/38] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2008/05] | Boyce, Conor, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06724640.5 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/05] | WO2006EP04006 | Priority number, date | US20050123972 | 06.05.2005 Original published format: US 123972 | [2008/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006119877 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1882360 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
H04N21/4113 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4117 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/42206 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNBEDIENUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR UNTERHALTUNGSELEKTRONIKGERÄTE | [2008/05] | English: | REMOTE CONTROL APPARATUS FOR CONSUMER ELECTRONIC APPLIANCES | [2008/05] | French: | TELECOMMANDE POUR ELECTRONIQUE GRAND PUBLIC | [2008/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 24.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1039772 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7,14-20,26,28-33,35,36,40-47,49,50,54-57 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 5,8-13,21-25,27,34,37-39,48,51-53,58-73; | [A]US2002084909 (STEFANIK JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-73 * paragraphs [0010] , [0036] - [0040] *; | [Y]US2002043557 (MIZOGUCHI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 5,8-13,34,37-39,48,51-53 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] , [0013]; figures 7,12 *; | [YA]WO0135664 (CROY CLEMENS [DE]) [Y] 21-25,27,58-73 * page 17 * * page 32 - page 34; figures 54-56 * [A] ; | [A]JPH10174009 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10174009 A 19980626 (ACCESS:KK) [A] 1-73 * abstract * | Examination | WO0157683 | US2003052860 |