EP1859180 - DIFFERENTIAL TRANSMISSION UNIT FEATURING ACTIVE CONTROLLING OF THE MOMENT DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Powertrain AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 35 8502 Lannach / AT | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACKL, Walter Rainstrasse 2a A-8071 Wagersbach / AT | 02 /
RAHM, Manfred Tallak 84 A-8103 Rein / AT | 03 /
SCHRANZ, Jürgen Alfred-Cossmanngasse 17 d A-8054 Graz / AT | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06724645.4 | 28.04.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006EP04018 | Priority number, date | AT20050000277U | 28.04.2005 Original published format: AT 2772005 U | [2007/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006114331 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1859180 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859180 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H48/22, B60K17/16 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
F16H48/22 (EP,KR,US);
B60K17/16 (KR);
F16H48/08 (EP,US);
F16H48/30 (EP,US);
B60K23/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | DIFFERENTIALGETRIEBEEINHEIT MIT AKTIVER STEUERUNG DER MOMENTENVERTEILUNG | [2007/48] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL TRANSMISSION UNIT FEATURING ACTIVE CONTROLLING OF THE MOMENT DISTRIBUTION | [2007/48] | French: | UNITE DE TRANSMISSION DIFFERENTIELLE A COMMANDE ACTIVE DE LA REPARTITION DU COUPLE | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 23.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.01.2009 | CZ | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | EE | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | IE | 14.01.2009 | IT | 14.01.2009 | LT | 14.01.2009 | LV | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | PL | 14.01.2009 | PT | 14.01.2009 | RO | 14.01.2009 | SI | 14.01.2009 | SK | 14.01.2009 | TR | 14.01.2009 | BG | 14.04.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | ES | 25.04.2009 | AT | 28.04.2009 | LU | 28.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | IS | 14.05.2009 | HU | 15.07.2009 | [2011/47] |
Former [2011/46] | CY | 14.01.2009 | |
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PT | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
TR | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/44] | CY | 14.01.2009 | |
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
TR | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5370588 (SAWASE KAORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 12, line 59 - column 13, line 38 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]EP0662402 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - column 4, line 12 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5910064 (KUROKI TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** figure 3 * |