EP2100234 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USER-CONTROLLED, MULTI-DIMENSIONAL NAVIGATION AND/OR SUBJECT-BASED AGGREGATION AND/OR MONITORING OF MULTIMEDIA DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netbreeze GmbH Ringstrasse 12 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Leo Weissenhaldenstrasse 15 CH-8427 Rorbas-Freienstein / CH | 02 /
RÜF, Francois Scheuchzerstrasse 164 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2009/31] | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 CH-4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06724875.7 | 23.02.2006 | [2009/38] | WO2006EP60235 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007095997 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100234 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100234 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
G06F16/904 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F16/9024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BENUTZERGESTEUERTEN MULTIDIMENSIONALEN NAVIGATION UND/ODER THEMENBASIERTEN AGGREGATION UND/ODER ÜBERWACHUNG VON MULTIMEDIADATEN | [2009/38] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USER-CONTROLLED, MULTI-DIMENSIONAL NAVIGATION AND/OR SUBJECT-BASED AGGREGATION AND/OR MONITORING OF MULTIMEDIA DATA | [2009/38] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA NAVIGATION MULTIDIMENSIONNELLE COMMANDEE PAR L'UTILISATEUR ET/OU AGREGATION THEMATIQUE ET/OU SURVEILLANCE DE DONNEES MULTIMEDIA | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 12.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 12.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 12.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 23.09.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2006 | CY | 27.07.2011 | CZ | 27.07.2011 | DK | 27.07.2011 | EE | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | IE | 27.07.2011 | IT | 27.07.2011 | LT | 27.07.2011 | LV | 27.07.2011 | NL | 27.07.2011 | PL | 27.07.2011 | RO | 27.07.2011 | SE | 27.07.2011 | SI | 27.07.2011 | SK | 27.07.2011 | TR | 27.07.2011 | BG | 27.10.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | ES | 07.11.2011 | IS | 27.11.2011 | PT | 28.11.2011 | LU | 23.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
TR | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
LU | 23.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
TR | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 27.07.2011 | |
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 27.07.2011 | |
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 27.07.2011 | |
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 27.07.2011 | |
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5832494 (EGGER DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10,24-33 * abstract * * figures 3a-3d * * figures 5a-5g *; | [X] - JAU-YUEN CHEN ET AL, "Hierarchical Browsing and Search of Large Image Databases", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200003), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1057-7149, XP011025536 [X] 1-10,24-33 * abstract * * section "II. General Approach and Notation", part "B. Bottom-Up Clustering * | [A] - CHIH-SHYANG CHANG ET AL, "Supporting Conceptual and Neighborhood Queries on the World Wide Web", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS: PART C: APPLICATIONS AND REVIEWS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199805), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 1094-6977, XP011057076 [A] 1,24,33 * abstract * * section "IV. Neighborhod Query" * | by applicant | US5832494 | - JAU-YUEN CHEN ET AL., "Hierarchical Browsing and Search of Large Image Databases", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (200003), vol. 9, no. 3 |