EP1861445 - FOULING RESISTANT POLYURETHANES, IN PARTICULAR FOR MARITIME USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAISER, Stefan Kirchstr. 14 49401 Damme / DE | 02 /
LYNAM, Ian 7 Poppyfields Ripley, derbyshire DE5855 / GB | 03 /
WIND, Michael Auf Der Lied 21 32689 Kalletal / DE | 04 /
CELIK, Alexander, Hayk 55 Brook Street Wymeswoid / GB | 05 /
KAMPF, Gunnar Zum Abendberg 4 B 32351 Stemwede-haldem / DE | [2007/49] | Application number, filing date | 06724981.3 | 08.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006EP60570 | Priority number, date | DE20051011990 | 14.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005011990 | [2007/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006097425 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861445 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861445 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/42, C08G18/48, C08K5/00, C09D175/06, C09D175/08, C08K5/37 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
C09D5/1637 (EP,US);
C08G18/42 (EP,US);
C08G18/48 (EP,US);
C08K5/0058 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0058, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C09D175/04, C08L2666/54 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOULINGRESISTENTE POLYURETHANE, INSBESONDERE FÜR MARITIME ANWENDUNGEN | [2007/49] | English: | FOULING RESISTANT POLYURETHANES, IN PARTICULAR FOR MARITIME USE | [2007/49] | French: | POLYURETHANNES RESISTANT AUX SALISSURES, NOTAMMENT POUR DES APPLICATIONS MARITIMES | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 14.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.07.2008 | CZ | 23.07.2008 | EE | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | IE | 23.07.2008 | LT | 23.07.2008 | LV | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | PL | 23.07.2008 | RO | 23.07.2008 | SI | 23.07.2008 | SK | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | BG | 23.10.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | ES | 03.11.2008 | IS | 23.11.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | HU | 24.01.2009 | AT | 08.03.2009 | LU | 08.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
HU | 24.01.2009 | ||
AT | 08.03.2009 | ||
LU | 08.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
AT | 08.03.2009 | ||
LU | 08.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
AT | 08.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
AT | 08.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 23.07.2008 | |
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5114984 (BRANCH CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 23 - line 31 * * example - * * claims 1,4 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]EP0746979 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [Y] 1-10 * claim - *; | [Y]US5922113 (VAN GESTEL JOZEF FRANS ELIZABE [BE]) [Y] 1-10 * claim - *; | [Y]WO0050508 (SEEFAR TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10* claims 1,15 *; | [Y] - KEVIN V. THOMAS, TIM W. FILEMAN, JAMES W. READMAN, MIKE J. WALDOCK, "Reports: Antifouling Paint Booster Biocides in the UK Coastal Environment and Potential Risks of Biological Effects", MARINE POLLUTION BULLETIN, GB, (2001), vol. 42, pages 677 - 688, XP002381016 [Y] 1-10 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0025-326X(00)00216-2 |