EP1888571 - New salt and polymorphs of a DPP-IV inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/08] | NEW SALT AND POLYMORPHS OF A DPP-IV INHIBITOR | ||
[2012/18] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRECHT, Stefan Im Letten 17 CH-4202 Duggingen / CH | 02 /
BUBENDORF, André, Gérard 35 rue du Gal Bethouart F-68510 Uffheim / FR | 03 /
GOETZOE, Stephan St. Arbogast-Strasse 19 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | 04 /
GRASSMANN, Olaf Blumenmuehlgasse 3 79400 Kandern / DE | 05 /
MONTAVON, Francois Rue des Romains 4 CH-2800 Delemont / CH | 06 /
MOOG, Regina Burgunderstrasse 17 79104 Freiburg / DE | 07 /
ROHRER, Franziska Untere Wenkenhofstrasse 20 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 08 /
RUF, Armin Jaegerhaeusleweg 11 79104 Freiburg / DE | 09 /
SCALONE, Michelangelo Baslerstrasse 14 CH-4127 Birsfelden / CH | 10 /
SCHWITTER, Urs Oerinstrasse 15 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | 11 /
WANG, Shaoning Schorenweg 40 CH-4058 Basel / CH | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
ABRECHT, Stefan Kirchstrasse 4 CH-4202 Duggingen / CH | ||
02 /
BUBENDORF, André, Gérard 35 rue du Gal Bethouart F-68510 Uffheim / FR | |||
03 /
GOETZOE, Stephan St. Arbogast-Strasse 19 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | |||
04 /
GRASSMANN, Olaf Blumenmuehlgasse 3 79400 Kandern / DE | |||
05 /
MONTAVON, Francois Rue des Romains 4 CH-2800 Delemont / CH | |||
06 /
MOOG, Regina Burgunderstrasse 17 79104 Freiburg / DE | |||
07 /
ROHRER, Franziska Untere Wenkenhofstrasse 20 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | |||
08 /
RUF, Armin Jaegerhaeusleweg 11 79104 Freiburg / DE | |||
09 /
SCALONE, Michelangelo Baslerstrasse 14 CH-4127 Birsfelden / CH | |||
10 /
SCHWITTER, Urs Oerinstrasse 15 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | |||
11 /
WANG, Shaoning Schorenweg 40 CH-4058 Basel / CH | Representative(s) | Waschbüsch, Klaus 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basle / CH | [2012/49] |
Former [2008/08] | Dey, Michael Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06724997.9 | 09.03.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006EP60589 | Priority number, date | EP20050102251 | 22.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05102251 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006100181 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1888571 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, A61K31/422, A61P3/04, A61P3/10 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/422 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neues Salz und Polymorphe eines DPP-IV-Inhibitors | [2012/18] | English: | New salt and polymorphs of a DPP-IV inhibitor | [2012/18] | French: | Nouveau sel et polymorphes d'un inhibiteur de DPP-IV | [2012/18] |
Former [2008/08] | NEUE SALZE UND POLYMORPHE EINES DPP-IV-INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2008/08] | NEW SALT AND POLYMORPHS OF A DPP-IV INHIBITOR | ||
Former [2008/08] | NOUVEAU SEL ET POLYMORPHES DE L'INHIBITEUR DE DPP-IV | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 13.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP0992503 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [XD] 19,25-27 * abstract * * page 6 - page 13 * * page 16 * * example 4; compound 7 * * claims 6,7 *; | [XD]WO03037327 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [XD] 1-37 * abstract * * page 28, line 10 - page 30, line 35 * * example 31 *; | [A]WO2004020407 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-37* abstract * |