EP1863349 - SULPHONYL COMPOUNDS FOR SEED TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON DEYN, Wolfgang An Der Bleiche 24 67435 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
KAISER, Florian Spelzenstr. 9 68167 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
POHLMAN, Matthias Bluntschlistr. 16 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
BASTIAANS, Henricus Maria Martinus Bartholomaeus-arnoldi-str. 35 61250 Usingen / DE | 05 /
BAUMANN, Ernst Falkenstr.6a 67373 Dudenhofen / DE | 06 /
RACK, Michael Hildastr. 11/1 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 07 /
ANSPAUGH, Douglas D. 4007 Winecott Drive Apex, NC 27502 / US | 08 /
COTTER, Henry Van Tuyl 8329 Lakewood Drive Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | 09 /
CULBERTSON, Deborah L. 6400 Vintage Ridge Lane Fuquay Varina, NC 27526 / US | 10 /
HOFMANN, Michael Lutherstr. 2 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 11 /
HICKS, Carol 8004 Looking Glass Ct. Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | [2007/50] | Application number, filing date | 06725244.5 | 22.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006EP60961 | Priority number, date | US20050664773P | 24.03.2005 Original published format: US 664773 P | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006100271 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1863349 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N41/06, A01P7/04 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
A01N41/06 (EP,US);
A01N41/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/50] | A01N41/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SULFONYLVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SAMEN | [2007/50] | English: | SULPHONYL COMPOUNDS FOR SEED TREATMENT | [2007/50] | French: | COMPOSES SULFONYLES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SEMENCES | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 05.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0377861 ; | [A]JPH0368550 ; | [DA]EP0033984 (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) [DA] 1-17 * CAS-RN 80022-91-9, 80022-92-0, 80022-94-2, 80022-95-3, 80023-04-7, 80023-15-0 *; | [PA]WO2005035486 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PA] 1-17 * page 61, lines 8-30 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910625), vol. 015, no. 248, Database accession no. (C - 0843), & JP03077861 A 19910403 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD; others: 01) [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910610), vol. 015, no. 227, Database accession no. (C - 0839), & JP03068550 A 19910325 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD; others: 01) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |