EP1866106 - USE OF HYDROPHOBINS FOR THE SURFACE TREATMENT OF HARDENED MINERAL BUILDING MATERIALS, NATURAL STONE, ARTIFICIAL STONE AND CERAMICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Heike Emil-Heckel-Str.16 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
BOLLSCHWEILER, Claus Karl-Christ-Str. 13 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
SUBKOWSKI, Thomas Wichernstr. 13 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 04 /
BAUS, Ulf Im Hallgarten 6b 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 05 /
LEMAIRE, Hans-Georg Mainstr.10 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 06 /
KAROS, Marvin Clementine-Bassermann-Str. 3 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | [2007/51] | Application number, filing date | 06725356.7 | 28.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006EP61092 | Priority number, date | DE20051014843 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005014843 | DE20051036339 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005036339 | [2007/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006103230 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866106 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866106 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B08B17/02, C04B41/46, C11D3/38, C03C17/28 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
C03C17/28 (EP,US);
C04B14/02 (KR);
B08B17/02 (EP,KR,US);
B28B19/00 (KR);
C04B41/46 (EP,US);
C04B41/48 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/46, C04B41/502 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | B08B17/02, B28B19/00, C04B41/48, C04B41/62, C04B41/82, C11D3/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | 30.10.2007 | BA | 30.10.2007 | HR | 30.10.2007 | MK | 30.10.2007 | YU | 30.10.2007 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HYDROPHOBINEN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON GEHÄRTETEN MINERALISCHEN BAUSTOFFEN, NATURSTEIN, KUNSTSTEIN UND KERAMIKEN | [2007/51] | English: | USE OF HYDROPHOBINS FOR THE SURFACE TREATMENT OF HARDENED MINERAL BUILDING MATERIALS, NATURAL STONE, ARTIFICIAL STONE AND CERAMICS | [2007/51] | French: | UTILISATION D'HYDROPHOBINES POUR TRAITER LA SURFACE DE MATERIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION MINERAUX DURCIS, DE PIERRE NATURELLE, DE PIERRE ARTIFICIELLE ET DE CERAMIQUES | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.05.2010 | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | IE | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | PL | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | SK | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 26.05.2010 | |
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 26.05.2010 | |
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 26.05.2010 | |
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 26.05.2010 | |
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | FI | 26.05.2010 | |
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0157528 (APPLIED NANOSYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-9* claim - *; | [PX]WO2005033316 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1,3,7-9 * page 14; claim - *; | [PA]WO2005068087 (APPLIED NANOSYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [PA] 1-9 * page 4; claim - * |