EP1868700 - USE OF HYDROPHOBIN AS A PHASE STABILISER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUZMANN, Marcus Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 2 69242 Mühlhausen / DE | 02 /
ECK, Peter Brunnengasse 4 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 03 /
BAUS, Ulf Im Hallgarten 6b 69221 Dossenheim / DE | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06725389.8 | 29.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006EP61133 | Priority number, date | EP20050007208 | 01.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05007208 | EP20050016962 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: EP 05016962 | [2007/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006103252 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1868700 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/05 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
C10G33/04 (EP,US);
B01D17/042 (EP,US);
B01D17/047 (EP,US);
C07K14/37 (EP,US);
C10L1/2381 (EP,US);
C10L1/2475 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HYDROPHOBIN ALS PHASEN-STABILISATOR | [2007/52] | English: | USE OF HYDROPHOBIN AS A PHASE STABILISER | [2007/52] | French: | UTILISATION D'HYDROPHOBINE COMME STABILISATEUR DE PHASES | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60206893 ; | [A]GB195876 (SHARPLES SPECIALTY CO) [A] 1,2,5,10,13,18 * page 1, line 47 - line 57; claims 1-6 * * page 2, line 6 - line 39 *; | [A]WO9409094 (YIM WON JAE [KR]) [A] 1,5,10,13,18* claims 1,2,5 *; | [DXA]WO9641882 (PROEFSTATION VOOR DE CHAMPIGNO [NL], et al) [DX] 1-16 * page 1, line 31 - line 35; examples 3-5; claims 1,21 * * page 8, line 14 - line 20 * * page 9, line 16 - line 37 * * page 40, line 20 - line 33 * [A] 17; | [A]WO0058342 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al) [A] 1-5,10-13 * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 13 *; | [DA]WO0160916 (CHALEN PAPIER EUROP SERVICE [FR], et al) [DA] 1,2,5,7,9,10,13,15,18 * claims 1,8-12,16-18 *; | [DXA]WO2004000880 (APPLIED NANOSYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [DX] 18-23 * page 2, line 7 - line 15; claims 1,9 * * page 4, line 7 - line 13 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 26 * * page 21, line 22 - line 26 * * page 24, line 3 - line 21 * [A] 1-3,5,10,11,13; | [A] - BAUER J A ET AL, "Three-dimensional Structure of YaaE from Bacillus subtilis, a Glutaminase Implicated in Pyridoxal-5'-phosphate Biosynthesis", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (20031028), vol. 279, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2704 - 2711, XP002388094 [A] 3,4,11,12,22,23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M310311200 | [A] - BELITSKY B R, "Physical and Enzymological Interaction of Bacillus subtilis Proteins Required for De Novo Pyridoxal 5'-Phosphate Biosynthesis", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (200402), vol. 186, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1191 - 1196, XP002388095 [A] 3,4,11,12,22,23 * page 1192 - page 1193 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.186.4.1191-1196.2004 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 48, Database accession no. 1985-299700, XP002419373 & JPS60206893 A 19851018 (SHIMADA Y) [A] 1,5,10,13,18,19 * abstract * |