EP1869147 - USE OF FUEL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAYTON, Christopher William Pool Lane, Ince Chester Cheshire CH2 4NU / GB | 02 /
DAHLSTROM, Mary Ann 22306 N. Lake Village Drive Katy, Texas 77450 / US | 03 /
LEE, George Robert Pool Lane, Ince Chester Cheshire CH2 4 NU / GB | 04 /
PRICE, Richard John Pool Lane, Ince Chester Cheshire CH2 4NU / GB | 05 /
SMITH, Susan Jane Pool Lane, Ince Chester Cheshire CH2 4NU / GB | 06 /
TAIT, Nigel Peter Pool Lane, Ince Chester Cheshire CH2 4NU / GB | 07 /
WALLINGTON, Jessica F Pool Lane, Ince Chester Cheshire CH2 4NU / GB | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2007/52] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 06725726.1 | 12.04.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006EP61549 | Priority number, date | EP20050252268 | 12.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05252268 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006108854 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1869147 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/08, C10G25/00, C10G25/02, C10L10/04 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
C10L1/08 (EP);
C10G25/00 (EP);
C10G25/02 (EP);
C10L10/04 (EP);
C10G2300/205 (EP);
C10G2400/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER BRENNSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2007/52] | English: | USE OF FUEL COMPOSITION | [2007/52] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSITION COMBUSTIBLE | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5300218 (GRAIFF ET AL) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 60 * * column 3, line 41 - line 55 * * column 4, line 1 - line 40 *; | [Y]US5133851 (BITTER ET AL) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 14 - line 26; example . *; | [Y]US6077421 (PURANIK ET AL) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 36 - line 48; claim - *; | [A]US4383915 (JOHNSON ET AL) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 23 - line 32 * * column 2, line 5 - line 12 * * column 3, line 21 - line 32 * * example I * * table i * * claims 1-3 * |