EP1853253 - DIOSMETIN DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF THROMBOTIC PATHOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Les Laboratoires Servier 12, Place de La Défense 92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERBEUREN, Tony 60bis, rue Aristide Briand F-78540 Vernouillet / FR | 02 /
RUPIN, Alain La Saintrie F-37510 Savonnières / FR | 03 /
SANSILVESTRI-MOREL, Patricia 15, rue Buffon F-92160 Antony / FR | 04 /
VALLEZ, Marie-Odile 17, rue Lavoisier F-93100 Montreuil / FR | 05 /
BOUSSARD, Marie-Françoise 11, route de Mareil-Montainville F-78124 Mareil-Sur-Mauldre / FR | 06 /
WIERZBICKI, Michel 8, résidence du Chemin Pavé F-78620 L'Etang-La-Ville / FR | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Bestel, Delphine, et al Les Laboratoires Servier Direction Brevets 35 rue de Verdun 92284 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [2010/10] |
Former [2007/46] | Bestel, Delphine Direction Brevets Les Laboratoires Servier 12, Place de la Défense F-92415 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 06725989.5 | 28.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006FR00441 | Priority number, date | FR20050002044 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: FR 0502044 | [2007/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092490 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853253 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/352, A61P7/02 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
C07D311/32 (KR);
A61K31/353 (KR);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | 14.08.2007 | BA | 14.08.2007 | HR | 14.08.2007 | MK | 14.08.2007 | YU | 14.08.2007 | Title | German: | DIOSMETINDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND VORBEUGUNG THROMBOTISCHER KRANKHEITSBILDER | [2007/46] | English: | DIOSMETIN DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF THROMBOTIC PATHOLOGIES | [2007/46] | French: | UTILISATION DE DERIVES DE LA DIOSMETINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA PREVENTION DES PATHOLOGIES THROMBOTIQUES | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 21.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0709383 (ADIR [FR]) [AD] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X] - CAYATTE ET AL., "S17834 A NEW INHIBITOR OF CELL ADHESION AND ATHEROSCLEROSIS THAT TARGETS NADPH OXIDASE", ARTEROSCLER. THROMB. VASC. BIOL., (2001), vol. 21, pages 1577 - 1584, XP002351653 [X] 1-6 * page 1578, column GAUCHE, paragraph 1 * * page 1582 * * page 1583, column GAUCHE, line DERNIERES * | [A] - VERBEUREN ET AL., "REGULATION OF ADHESION MOLECULES: A NEW TARGET FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC VENOUS INSUFFICIENCY", MICROCIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 7, pages S41 - S48, XP009055441 [A] 1-6 * page S43; figure 2 * * page S46, column GAUCHE, paragraph 3 - column DROITE, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/713774008 |