EP1858314 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A HOUSING FOR A MOWER CUTTER BAR AND HOUSING THUS PRODUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTER, René 6 Rue d'Afrique F-57620 Goetzenbruck / FR | 02 /
KIRCH, Jacky 7, Rue du Donon F-67700 Otterswiller / FR | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Andres, Jean-Claude, et al Kuhn S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67706 Saverne Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Andres, Jean-Claude, et al Kuhn S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67706 Saverne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06726210.5 | 01.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006FR50186 | Priority number, date | FR20050050603 | 08.03.2005 Original published format: FR 0550603 | [2007/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006095106 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1858314 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1858314 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/66, A01D34/81 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
A01D34/664 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49451 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEHÄUSES FÜR EINEN MÄHERSCHNEIDBALKEN UND SO HERGESTELLTES GEHÄUSE | [2007/48] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A HOUSING FOR A MOWER CUTTER BAR AND HOUSING THUS PRODUCED | [2007/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN CARTER DE BARRE DE COUPE D'UNE FAUCHEUSE A DISQUES ET CARTER OBTENU | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 31.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | IE | 19.11.2008 | LT | 19.11.2008 | LV | 19.11.2008 | RO | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | TR | 19.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | SE | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | ES | 01.03.2009 | LU | 01.03.2009 | IS | 19.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | HU | 20.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | EE | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
LU | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | EE | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
LU | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | EE | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | EE | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | EE | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 19.11.2008 | |
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 19.11.2008 | |
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 01.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2255835 (MULTINORM BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,9,13 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 39; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4738328 (HAYDEN RONALD G [US]) [A] 1,9,13* column 6, line 24 - line 30; figures 1,6; claim 1 *; | [A]US5212936 (LAURITSEN GEORG [DK]) [A] 1,9,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5221585 (KRESSE JR ALFRED L [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 46 - line 56; figure 7 *; | [A]US6052980 (FRIESEN HENRY [CA]) [A] 1,9,13 * the whole document * |