EP1868586 - ANTI-INFLAMMATORY FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKL Inflammatory Limited P.O. Box 568, Barclays Bank Chambers Le Grand Rue, St. Martins Guernsey, Channel Island GY1 6JS / GB | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARKINS, Nicholas, John Can Xifra Do Cta.de l'Esparra E-17421 Riudarenes / ES | [2012/47] |
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
LARKINS, Nicholas, John Can Xifra Do Cta.de l'Esparra E-17421 Riudarenes / ES | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Bates, Philip Ian, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2007/52] | Bates, Philip Ian, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06726682.5 | 07.04.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006GB01279 | Priority number, date | GB20050007208 | 08.04.2005 Original published format: GB 0507208 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106350 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868586 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868586 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K31/12, A61K36/71, A61K36/484, A61K31/216, A61K36/65 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/216 (EP,GB,US);
A61K31/12 (EP,GB,US);
A61K36/65 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/12, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/216, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/65, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/52] | A61K9/48, A61K31/12, A61K36/71, A61K36/484 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Title | German: | ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE FORMULIERUNG | [2007/52] | English: | ANTI-INFLAMMATORY FORMULATION | [2007/52] | French: | FORMULATION ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 05.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.01.2012 | 17.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5481043 (WAGNER HILDEBERT [DE], et al); | [A]CN1130079 (SHANGHAI CITY BONE INJURY RESE [CN]); | [X]WO0107062 (RAJGARHIA ASHOK [IN]); | [A]US6492429 (GRAUS IVO MARIA FRANCISCUS [NL], et al); |