EP1866777 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING SYSTEM INACTIVITY DURING TIME DATA FLOAT DELAY AND EXTERNAL MEMORY WRITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atmel Corporation 2325 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Atmel Corporation 2325, Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATULIK, Eric Le Village, Rue Des Sorbiers F-13590 Meyreuil / FR | 02 /
RESCANIERES, Nicolas Le Riviera, 718 Avenue Bel Air F-06270 Villeneuve Loubet / FR | 03 /
LAFAGE, Anne 14 chemin du Belvedere F-13100 Aix en Provence / FR | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06727521.4 | 24.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006IB00957 | Priority number, date | FR20050003089 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: FR 0503089 | US20050128109 | 11.05.2005 Original published format: US 128109 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006103563 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1866777 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F3/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
G06F13/405 (EP);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F13/40 (KR);
G06F13/4243 (EP);
G06F3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2008/28] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON SYSTEMINAKTIVITÄT WÄHREND EINER ZEITDATEN-FLOAT-VERZÖGERUNG UND EINES EXTERNEN SPEICHERSCHREIBVORGANGS | [2007/51] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING SYSTEM INACTIVITY DURING TIME DATA FLOAT DELAY AND EXTERNAL MEMORY WRITE | [2007/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE L'INACTIVITE D'UN SYSTEME AU COURS DU RETARD FLOTTANT DE DONNEES ET DE L'ECRITURE MEMOIRE EXTERNE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0054165 (ATMEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-21* figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US6097218 (CALLICOTT STEVEN P [US], et al); | [A]US5651138 (LE CHINH HOANG [US], et al); | [A]US5850541 (SUGIMOTO HIDEKI [JP]); | [A]US5822779 (INTRATER GIDEON [IL], et al) | by applicant | WO0054165 |