EP1851236 - MACROLIDES WITH ANTI-INFLAMMATORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline istrazivacki centar Zagreb d.o.o. Prilaz Baruna Filipovica 29 10000 Zagreb / HR | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CULIC, Ognjen Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline Zagreb 10000 / HR | 02 /
BOSNAR, Martina Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 03 /
MARJANOVIC, Nikola Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 10000 Zagreb / HR | 04 /
JELIC, Dubravko Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 05 /
ALIHODZIC, Sulejman Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 06 /
VELA, Vanja Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 07 /
MARUSIC-ISTUK, Zorica Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 10000 Zagreb / HR | 08 /
ERAKOVIC, Vesna Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 09 /
BOSNJAK, Berislav Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 10 /
HRVACIC, Boska Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 11 /
TOMASKOVIC, Marija Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 12 /
MUNIC, Vesna Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 13 /
IVETIC, Vanesa Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 14 /
HUTINEC, Antun Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithkline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 15 /
KRAGOL, Goran Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | 16 /
LELJAK, Marija Prilaz baruna Filipovica 29 GlaxoSmithKline 10000 Zagreb / HR | [2009/50] |
Former [2007/45] | 01 /
CULIC, Ognjen Medvedgradska 70 Zagreb 10000 / HR | ||
02 /
BOSNAR, Martina Orahovac 46 10000 Zagreb / HR | |||
03 /
MARJANOVIC, Nikola Divkoviceva 17 10090 Zagreb / HR | |||
04 /
JELIC, Dubravko Mirnovecka 11 10430 Samobor / HR | |||
05 /
ALIHODZIC, Sulejman Brazilska 10 10090 Zagreb / HR | |||
06 /
VELA, Vanja Gajnice 15 10090 Zagreb / HR | |||
07 /
MARUSIC-ISTUK, Zorica F. Krsinica 11 10430 Samobor / HR | |||
08 /
ERAKOVIC, Vesna Lipa 40a 51000 Rijeka / HR | |||
09 /
BOSNJAK, Berislav Mihovljanska 19 10000 Zagreb / HR | |||
10 /
HRVACIC, Boska Medvescak 72 10000 Zagreb / HR | |||
11 /
TOMASKOVIC, Marija Aleja A. Augustincica 14 10000 Zagreb / HR | |||
12 /
MUNIC, Vesna Cvjetno Naselje 17 10410 Velika Gorica / HR | |||
13 /
IVETIC, Vanesa Ksavera Sandora Dalskog 44 10000 Zagreb / HR | |||
14 /
HUTINEC, Antun Kupreska 6 10040 Zageb / HR | |||
15 /
KRAGOL, Goran Kombolova 13 10000 Zagreb / HR | |||
16 /
LELJAK, Marija Ravninsko 35 49225 Durmanec / HR | Representative(s) | Crawley, Karen Anne GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Crawley, Karen Anne GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 06727595.8 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006IB01238 | Priority number, date | US20050643841P | 13.01.2005 Original published format: US 643841 P | US20050715828P | 09.09.2005 Original published format: US 715828 P | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006087644 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1851236 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1851236 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/00, A61K31/7048, C07H17/08, A61P29/00, A61K31/7052 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
C07H17/00 (EP,US);
C07H17/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7048 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
C07D413/14 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | 09.08.2007 | BA | 09.08.2007 | HR | 09.08.2007 | MK | 09.08.2007 | YU | 09.08.2007 | Title | German: | MAKROLIDE MIT ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDER WIRKUNG | [2007/45] | English: | MACROLIDES WITH ANTI-INFLAMMATORY ACTIVITY | [2007/45] | French: | MACROLIDES PRESENTANT UNE ACTIVITE ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0126344 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1 * example 16; claims 1,2,5-7 *; | [X]EP0895999 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [X] 1,12 * page 35, 47 *; | [X]WO2004005310 (PLIVA D D [HR], et al) [X] 1 * compound ML10; page 78 *; | [A]WO2004101586 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | [A] - CULIC O ET AL, "ANTI-INFLAMMATORY EFFECTS OF MACROLIDE ANTIBIOTICS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011019), vol. 429, no. 1 - 3, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 209 - 229, XP009064025 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-2999(01)01321-8 |