EP1879470 - FAT, WAX OR OIL-BASED FOOD INGREDIENT COMPRISING ENCAPSULATED FLAVORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRA, Jérôme 25, Impasse Barth, Verrières F-74160 Neydens / FR | 02 /
LE, Anh 405 South Broad Street Middletown, Delaware 19709 / US | 03 /
MAUREL, Catherine 4, Chemin Vandel CH-1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | 04 /
CHIAVERINI, Michael 4160 Hunt Court Boulder, Colorado 80303 / US | 05 /
GORDON, Jonathan F. 40 Rockland Drive South Kingstown, Rhode Island 02879-3151 / US | 06 /
NORMAND, Valéry 495, Chemin De Charny F-74490 St-Jeoire-En-Faucigny / FR | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Dale, Gavin Christopher Firmenich SA Legal Dpartment - IP Group Route des Jeunes 1 P.O. Box 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Dale, Gavin Christopher Firmenich SA Legal Dept. IP Group 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 06727964.6 | 19.04.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006IB51203 | Priority number, date | EP20050103732 | 04.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05103732 | US20050677995P | 04.05.2005 Original published format: US 677995 P | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117705 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879470 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1879470 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/22, A23L1/30 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
A23L33/14 (EP,US);
A23L27/72 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/224, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELBESTANDTEIL AUF FETT-, WACHS- ODER ÖLGRUNDLAGE ENTHALTEND VERKAPSELTE AROMEN | [2008/04] | English: | FAT, WAX OR OIL-BASED FOOD INGREDIENT COMPRISING ENCAPSULATED FLAVORS | [2008/04] | French: | INGREDIENT ALIMENTAIRE A BASE DE MATIERE GRASSE, DE CIRE OU D'HUILE PRESENTANT DES AROMES ENCAPSULEES | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 08.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.2009 | BE | 04.11.2009 | CY | 04.11.2009 | CZ | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | EE | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | IT | 04.11.2009 | LT | 04.11.2009 | LV | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | PL | 04.11.2009 | RO | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | SI | 04.11.2009 | SK | 04.11.2009 | TR | 04.11.2009 | BG | 04.02.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | IS | 04.03.2010 | PT | 04.03.2010 | IE | 19.04.2010 | LU | 19.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
NL | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 19.04.2010 | ||
LU | 19.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 19.04.2010 | ||
LU | 19.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 19.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 19.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 19.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1454534 (SAN EI GEN FFI INC [JP]) [X] 1-20 * page 2, paragraphs 1,7 * * page 3, paragraphs 9,14,15 * * page 4, paragraph 23 *; | [DAP]WO2005067733 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [DAP] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [APD]WO2006006003 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [APD] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A] - LYNE A, "Encapsulated flavourings - using the yeast cell", FOOD INGREDIENTS AND ANALYSIS INTERNATIONAL, LONDON, GB, (2002), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 8 - 9, XP009030880 [A] 1-20 | [A] - NELSON G ET AL, "Yeast delivery system", FOOD INGREDIENTS AND ANALYSIS INTERNATIONAL, LONDON, GB, (199809), pages 13 - 14, XP009030829 [A] 1-20 |