EP1898742 - FRAGRANCE TESTER AND METHOD OF APPLYING A FRAGRANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITMAKESENSE LTD 7 Hamagid Street 65224 Tel Aviv / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states ITMAKESENCE LTD 7 Hamagid Street 65224 Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESHEF-GOZLAN, Vered 7 Hamagid Street 65224 Tel Aviv / IL | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06728204.6 | 30.03.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006IL00401 | Priority number, date | IL20050167810 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: IL 16781005 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006103670 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1898742 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1898742 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1898742 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A45D34/04 (EP,US);
A45D34/00 (KR);
G09F5/04 (EP,US);
A45D2200/1018 (EP,US);
A45D2200/1036 (EP,US);
A45D34/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUFTTESTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINES DUFTS | [2008/12] | English: | FRAGRANCE TESTER AND METHOD OF APPLYING A FRAGRANCE | [2008/12] | French: | TESTEUR DE PARFUM ET PROCEDE D APPLICATION D UN PARFUM | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.11.2009 | BE | 11.11.2009 | CY | 11.11.2009 | CZ | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | EE | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | LT | 11.11.2009 | LV | 11.11.2009 | NL | 11.11.2009 | PL | 11.11.2009 | RO | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | SI | 11.11.2009 | SK | 11.11.2009 | TR | 11.11.2009 | BG | 11.02.2010 | GR | 12.02.2010 | IS | 11.03.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | IE | 30.03.2010 | LU | 30.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
NL | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
LU | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
LU | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US4852489 (WALL ALEXANDER C [US], et al) [XD] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004165935 (KAUFFMANN MYRIAM [FR], et al)[A] 1-15; | [PX]CH694884 (PITTELOUD STEPHANE [CH], et al) [PX] 1,16,17 * columns 2-3; figure 3 * |