EP1869392 - EXTREMELY INSENSITIVE DETONATING SUBSTANCE AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rafael Advanced Defense Systems Ltd. P.O. Box 2250 31021 Haifa / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Rafael Advanced Defense Systems Ltd. P.O.Box 2250 31021 Haifa / IL | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Rafael-Armament Development Authority Ltd. P.O. Box 2250 31021 Haifa / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN-ARAZI, Yael 16 Meron Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | 02 /
SOKOL-BARAK, Edith 13/6 Dror street 3091785 Zichron Yaakov / IL | 03 /
FRILING, Samuel 16 Meron Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | 04 /
SHAKED, Ilan 30/8 Kaplan Street 22443 Nahariya / IL | [2014/03] |
Former [2013/47] | 01 /
COHEN-ARAZI, Yael 16 Meron Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | ||
02 /
SOKOL-BARAK, Edith 13/6 Dror street Zichron Yaakov 3091785 / IL | |||
03 /
FRILING, Samuel 16 Meron Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | |||
04 /
SHAKED, Ilan 30/8 Kaplan Street 22443 Nahariya / IL | |||
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
COHEN-ARAZI, Yael 16 Meron Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | ||
02 /
SOKOL-BARAK, Edith 58 Hazamir Street 22260 Naharia / IL | |||
03 /
FRILING, Samuel 16 Meron Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | |||
04 /
SHAKED, Ilan 30/8 Kaplan Street 22443 Nahariya / IL | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Vossius & Partner, et al P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Vossius & Partner, et al Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06728258.2 | 11.04.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006IL00457 | Priority number, date | IL20050167985 | 12.04.2005 Original published format: IL 16798505 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006109304 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1869392 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1869392 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/007, C06B23/00, C06B45/12 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
C06B45/12 (EP,US);
C06B23/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | HR | 17.10.2007 | Title | German: | ÄUSSERST UNEMPFINDLICHE DETONATIONSSUBSTANZ UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/52] | English: | EXTREMELY INSENSITIVE DETONATING SUBSTANCE AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | [2007/52] | French: | MATIERE DETONANTE EXTREMEMENT PEU SENSIBLE ET PROCEDE D'ELABORATION | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2006 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | ES | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | IE | 11.04.2014 | LU | 11.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | FR | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.04.2006 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
IS | 15.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3725154 (MC CULLOCH C, et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [DX]US4861397 (HILLSTROM WARREN W [US]) [DX] 1,19 * claim - *; | JPH02293388 [ ] (JAPAN TECH RES & DEV INST, et al); | [DX]US5080735 (WAGNER MARTIN G [US]) [DX] 1-7,13,14,19-23 * claim - *; | [Y]EP0625495 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,19 * claim - *; | [A]DE2831415 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG [DE]) [A] 1,19* claim - *; | [Y]WO2004039752 (RAFAEL ARMAMENT DEV AUTHORITY [IL], et al) [Y] 1,19 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 2 * * page 9; claim - *; | [X] - TOBE YOICHIRO ET AL., "Fire - resistant explosive compositions", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 114:146427, URL: STN, XP002396585 [X] 1,19 * abstract * |