EP1870721 - INSULATION INSPECTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states Nitto Shinko Corporation 110-1-1, Funayose Maruoka-cho Sakai-shi, Fukui, 910-0381 / JP | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nitto Shinko Corporation 110-1-1, Funayose Maruoka-cho Sakai-shi, Fukui, 910-0381 / JP | |||
For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0041 / JP | |||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nitto Shinko Corporation 110-1-1, Funayose Maruoka-cho Sakai-shi, Fukui, 910-0381 / JP | |||
For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIHARA, Hiroshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 02 /
FUJIKI, Jun c/o NITTO SHINKO CORPORATION 110-1-1, Funayose, Maruoka-cho Sakai-shi, Fukui, 9100381 / JP | 03 /
KIYOHARA, Susumu c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-ch ome, Ibaraki-shi, Osaka, 5670041 / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
AIHARA, Hiroshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIKI, Jun c/o NITTO SHINKO CORPORATION 110-1-1, Funayose, Maruoka-cho Sakai-shi, Fukui, 9100381 / JP | |||
03 /
KIYOHARA, Susumu c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-ch ome, Ibaraki-shi, Osaka, 5670041 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/30] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06728744.1 | 01.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006JP304425 | Priority number, date | JP20050057657 | 02.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005057657 | [2007/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006093323 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870721 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870721 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/12, G01R31/16, G01R31/06, G01R31/34 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G01R31/346 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/52] | G01R31/12, G01R31/16, G01R31/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/24] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÜFEN VON ISOLIERUNGEN | [2007/52] | English: | INSULATION INSPECTING APPARATUS | [2007/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION DE L'ISOLATION | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2007 | Translation filed | 30.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0414399 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 5,10* page 7, lines 30-49 *; | [Y]US5867029 (IIJIMA YASUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 63; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2002148300 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2004347523 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |