EP1867239 - THICKENING COMPOSITION IMPROVED IN VISCOSITY MANIFESTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5, Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0825 / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Taiyokagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5, Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0825 / JP | ||
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Taiyokagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5, Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0825 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKO, Yoshinori c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5 Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0825 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Tomohiro c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5 Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0825 / JP | 03 /
NISHIKAWA, Shuji c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5 Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0825 / JP | [2016/26] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
SEKO, Yoshinori c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5 Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0825 / JP | ||
02 /
KIMURA, Tomohiro c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5 Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0825 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIKAWA, Shuji c/o Taiyo Kagaku Co., Ltd. 9-5 Akahorishinmachi Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0825 / JP | Representative(s) | Chautard, Cécile Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Chautard, Cécile Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2012/41] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06728755.7 | 08.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006JP304436 | Priority number, date | JP20050069114 | 11.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005069114 | [2007/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006095756 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867239 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1867239 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23L29/20, A23L27/60, A23L29/269 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A23L27/60 (EP,BR,US);
A23L29/20 (KR);
A23L29/27 (EP,BR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/52] | A23L1/05, A23L1/24, A23L1/054 | ||
Former IPC [2007/51] | A23L1/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERDICKUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER VISKOSITÄT | [2007/51] | English: | THICKENING COMPOSITION IMPROVED IN VISCOSITY MANIFESTATION | [2007/51] | French: | COMPOSITION EPAISSISSANTE DE VISCOSITE APPARENTE AMELIOREE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2007 | Translation filed | 15.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 04.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2006 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | IE | 08.03.2017 | LU | 08.03.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3804951 (RAPP H) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4487866 (ALMOND STEPHEN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0602990 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [Y]US5728825 (WONG PHILIP [US]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH10204408 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0937410 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 15]; claim - *; | [X]WO2004096906 (RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE [GB], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 2, lines 4-31; example -; claim - * * page 10, lines 14-19 * |