EP1856906 - IMAGE OUTPUTTING SYSTEM, IMAGE CAPTURING APPARATUS, OUTPUT APPARATUS, IMAGE OUTPUT METHOD, IMAGE CAPTURING METHOD, OUTPUT METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISOMURA, Ayumu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 26-30, Nishiazabu 2 -chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo, 1068620 / JP | 02 /
ONO, Shuji@c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa, 2588538 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
ISOMURA, Ayumu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 26-30, Nishiazabu 2 -chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo, 1068620 / JP | ||
02 /
ONO, Shuji c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa, 2588538 / JP | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06728963.7 | 07.03.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006JP304848 | Priority number, date | JP20050062882 | 07.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005062882 | JP20060019540 | 27.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006019540 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006095900 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1856906 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1856906 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/91, H04N5/262 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
H04N5/262 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | H04N5/225, H04N5/91 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/16] |
Former [2008/14] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BILDAUSGABESYSTEM, BILDERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG, AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG, BILDAUSGABEVERFAHREN, BIDLERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN; AUSGABEVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2007/47] | English: | IMAGE OUTPUTTING SYSTEM, IMAGE CAPTURING APPARATUS, OUTPUT APPARATUS, IMAGE OUTPUT METHOD, IMAGE CAPTURING METHOD, OUTPUT METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2007/47] | French: | SYSTEME, APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE GENERATION D'IMAGES, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CAPTURE D'IMAGES ET PROGRAMME CORRESPONDANT | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 08.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2013 | 24.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5937214 (SHINTANI DAI [JP], et al); | [XYI]US2003030669 (ONO SHUJI [JP]) | Examination | WO9834400 | US6803945 |