EP1865239 - RELIEF VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD. 11-20 Nishi Gotanda 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NITTA, Toshinori c/o FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD., 840, Mihashi 1-chome, Oh miya-ku, Saitama-shi, Saitama, 3300856 / JP | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06729121.1 | 15.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP305100 | Priority number, date | JP20050095363 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005095363 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006103927 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865239 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865239 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/06 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
F16K17/06 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7936 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/27] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTLÜFTUNGSVENTIL | [2007/50] | English: | RELIEF VALVE | [2007/50] | French: | SOUPAPE DE DECHARGE | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2007 | Translation filed | 18.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6237893 (ROSE PAUL S [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 4, lines 19-51; figure 1 * [Y] 8; | [XY]US2072271 (MEADOWS CLAUDE C) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [Y] 8; | [Y]US3800824 (MEDINA C) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5971016 (WASS LLOYD G [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * abstract *; | [Y]DE1806748 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * |