EP1909329 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANKEN ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-3, 3-chome, Kitano Niiza-shi Saitama 352-8666 / JP | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORII, Katsuyuki, c/o Sanken Electric Co., Ltd. 6-3, Kitano 3-chome Niiza-shi, Saitama 352-8666 / JP | [2011/44] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
TORII, Katsuyuki, c/o Sanken Electric Co., Ltd. 6-3, Kitano 3-chome Niiza-shi, Saitama 352-8666 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06729670.7 | 22.03.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006JP305703 | Priority number, date | JP20050207685 | 15.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005207685 | [2008/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010646 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909329 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909329 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/739, H01L27/04, H01L25/04, H01L27/00, H01L27/088, H01L29/78 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
H01L23/49575 (EP,US);
H01L29/739 (KR);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L25/04 (KR);
H01L25/071 (EP,US);
H01L27/00 (KR);
H01L27/04 (KR);
H01L29/7395 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05554 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0603 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L27/0688 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1305 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13055 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/13091 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48247 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/33] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2008/15] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2008/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2008 | Translation filed | 06.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 16.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6081039 (FURNIVAL COURTNEY [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1022785 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP1231635 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US6642576 (SHIRASAWA TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP1411551 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [Y]WO2005018001 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [E]EP1657750 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5 * abstract * |