EP1864662 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR THROMBOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-8625 / JP | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA, Toru 8-12, Shimizu 2-chome, Suginami-ku Tokyo, 1670033 / JP | 02 /
AOKI, Taro Domiru Tokorozawa 301, 3-19-1, Kusunoki-dai, Tokor ozawa-shi, Saitama, 3590037 / JP | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershauser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06730073.1 | 27.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP306125 | Priority number, date | US20050665390P | 28.03.2005 Original published format: US 665390 P | US20050158080 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: US 158080 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006104086 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864662 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A61K31/616, A61P7/02 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (KR);
A61K31/36 (EP,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K31/616 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/22, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/36, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | 12.09.2007 | BA | 12.09.2007 | HR | 12.09.2007 | MK | 12.09.2007 | YU | 12.09.2007 | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHES MITTEL GEGEN THROMBOSE | [2007/50] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR THROMBOSIS | [2007/50] | French: | AGENT THERAPEUTIQUE ANTITHROMBOTIQUE | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2007 | Translation filed | 12.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 18.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9811896 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-6 * abstract * * claims 1,4, 43 *; | [X]WO02078625 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * claims 5,8,20,21,30,31 *; | [Y]WO03094923 (SCARAMUZZINO GIOVANNI [IT]) [Y] 1-6* claims 1-6, 10 *; | [X]EP1488808 (KOWA CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 17] , [0 27] *; | [Y]EP1498139 (KOWA CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 25] * |