25.01.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
21.12.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
17.02.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
14.02.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.02.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.10.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.11.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.07.2009 |
First examination report |
|
03.07.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.03.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
27.03.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
06.06.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
16.11.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
31.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|