Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011067785 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90519107 | 28.09.2007 | WO2006JP306240 | 28.03.2006 | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | US95247110 | 23.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7905967 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2008078478 | 03.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP306240 | 28.03.2006 | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4992711B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2012 | B2 | JPWO2006106650 | 11.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007512531 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006JP306240 | 28.03.2006 | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1867737 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2012 | B1 | EP1867737 | 29.04.2009 | A4 | EP1867737 | 19.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP306240 | 28.03.2006 | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0608954 | 20.06.2017 | B1 | BRPI0608954 | 17.02.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP306240 | 28.03.2006 | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101146917B | 17.11.2010 | B | CN101146917 | 19.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP306240 | 28.03.2006 | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007011957 | 12.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP06240 | 28.03.2006 | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006106650 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR052732 | 28.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2358020 | 10.06.2009 | C1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005098221 | 30.03.2005 |