Designated contracting states | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | Examination procedure | 09.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2007 | Translation filed | | 20.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | | 20.09.2007 | Search fee paid | | 20.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 20.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | European patent granted | 21.03.2012 | Opposition procedure | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2013 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 19.12.2007 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20070920 | | Event date: | 19.12.2007 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Event date: | 09.07.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Event date: | 09.07.2008 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 29.04.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C21D 6/00 20060101AFI20061017BHEP | | Event date: | 29.04.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C22C 38/00 20060101ALI20090323BHEP | | Event date: | 29.04.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C22C 38/26 20060101ALI20090323BHEP | | Event date: | 29.04.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C21D 9/08 20060101ALI20090323BHEP | | Event date: | 29.04.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C22C 38/18 20060101ALI20090323BHEP | | Event date: | 29.04.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C22C 38/22 20060101ALI20090323BHEP | | Event date: | 29.04.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C22C 38/24 20060101ALI20090323BHEP | | Event date: | 29.04.2009 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20090327 | | Event date: | 12.08.2009 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20090708 | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 21.03.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Event date: | 16.05.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20120516 | | Event date: | 23.01.2013 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION | | Event date: | 27.02.2013 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20130102 | | Event date: | 18.04.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20130102 | | Event date: | 06.11.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131010 AND 20131016 | | Event date: | 02.04.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE LORENZ SEIDLER GOSS, DE | | Event date: | 08.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP | Effective DATE: | 20140402 | | Event date: | 08.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE LORENZ SEIDLER GOSS, DE | Effective DATE: | 20140402 | | Event date: | 08.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP | Effective DATE: | 20120323 | | Event date: | 08.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | LORENZ SEIDLER GOSSEL RECHTSANWAELTE PATENTANW, DE | Effective DATE: | 20140402 | | Event date: | 08.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 13.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 23.02.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 03.09.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | LORENZ SEIDLER GOSSEL RECHTSANWAELTE PATENTANW, DE | | Event date: | 03.09.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602006028302 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NIPPON STEEL CORP., JP | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, TOKYO, JP | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20200221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20200318 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 17.02.2012 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 14.02.2012 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 11.10.2011 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 16.11.2007 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 25.01.2013 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 24.11.2021 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20210328 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20210328 | | Event date: | 25.01.2013 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20210328 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20240130 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240213 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | |