EP1866757 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING DOCUMENTS WITH MULTIPLE NETWORK APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITADA, Hiroshi c/o RICOH AMERICA'S CORPORATION 5 Dedrick Place West Caldwell, New Jersey 07006 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06730553.2 | 23.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006JP306605 | Priority number, date | US20050092836 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: US 92836 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106793 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866757 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06Q10/00 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99954 (US)
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/25] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON DOKUMENTEN MIT MEHREREN NETZWERKANWENDUNGEN | [2007/51] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING DOCUMENTS WITH MULTIPLE NETWORK APPLICATIONS | [2007/51] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE DOCUMENTS A APPLICATIONS DE RESEAU MULTIPLES | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 31.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 11.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/46] | 23.06.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003217095 (KITADA HIROSHI [US], et al) [X] 1-50* the whole document * | Examination | - Thomas Powell, "Chapter 15: Plug-ins, ActiveX Controls", HTML & XHTM: The Complete Reference (4th Edition), Osborne, (20030819), pages 473 - 496, ISBN 078-3-25-404211-7, XP055184392 |