EP1864645 - FLUORINE ION-RELEASABLE COMPOSITION FOR DENTAL PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Noritake Dental Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2012/42] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Kuraray Medical Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEI, Mitsuru Kuraray Medical Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108622 / JP | 02 /
KITA, Hirotaka Kuraray Medical Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108622 / JP | 03 /
OHARA, Yasujiro Kuraray Medical Inc. 1-1-3, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008115 / JP | [2012/48] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
OHARA, Yasujiro c/o Kuraray Medical Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108622 / JP | ||
02 /
KITA, Hirotaka c/o Kuraray Medical Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108622 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKEI, Mitsuru c/o Kuraray Medical Inc. 1-1-3, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008115 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06730637.3 | 30.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP306689 | Priority number, date | JP20050097353 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005097353 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106838 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864645 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1864645 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
A61K6/896 (EP,US);
A61K6/00 (KR);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/896, C08L83/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/50] | A61K6/08, A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | FLUORIONEN FREISETZENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DENTALZWECKE | [2007/50] | English: | FLUORINE ION-RELEASABLE COMPOSITION FOR DENTAL PURPOSES | [2007/50] | French: | COMPOSITION LIBERANT DES IONS FLUOR A DES FINS DENTAIRES | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2000 | Translation filed | 27.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2014
06.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE VOCO GmbH Anton-Flettner-Strasse 1-3 27472 Cuxhaven / DE | 02
21.02.2014
06.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 FL-9494 Schaan / LI Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2014
06.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE VOCO GmbH Anton-Flettner-Strasse 1-3 27472 Cuxhaven / DE | ||
02
21.02.2014
06.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 FL-9494 Schaan / LI Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2014/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE VOCO GmbH Anton-Flettner-Strasse 1-3 27472 Cuxhaven / DE | 28.04.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.07.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.02.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2006 | AT | 22.05.2013 | CH | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | LI | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | IE | 30.03.2014 | LU | 30.03.2014 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/21] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CH | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
LU | 30.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CH | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
LU | 30.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CH | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
LU | 30.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.03.2014 | ||
LU | 30.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 30.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0821931 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 3, line 38 - page 5, line 17 * * page 5, line 53 - page 6, line 58 ** examples 1-28; claims 1-5 * |