EP1865671 - COMMUNICATION HANDOVER METHOD AND COMMUNICATION MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASO, Keigo, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 06730652.2 | 30.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP306704 | Priority number, date | JP20050097400 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005097400 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106846 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865671 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/12 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
H04W36/12 (EP,US);
H04W40/36 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/50] | H04L12/56, H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | 25.09.2007 | BA | 25.09.2007 | HR | 25.09.2007 | MK | 25.09.2007 | YU | 25.09.2007 | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONS-HANDOVER-VERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSNACHRICHTEN-VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/50] | English: | COMMUNICATION HANDOVER METHOD AND COMMUNICATION MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2007/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGE DE COMMUNICATION | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2007 | Translation filed | 25.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 07.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/12] | 05.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004264476 (ALARCON LEOPOLDO [ES], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0051] - [0081]; figure 1 *; | [Y] - MONTAVONT T NOEL LSIIT M KASSI FRANCE TELECOM R&D N, "Mobile IPv6 for multiple interfaces; draft-montavont-mip6-mmi-01.txt", 20031022, (20031022), no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015032639 [Y] 1-21 * sections 1.-2.; pages 3-4 * * section 3.- section 4.2; pages 6-9 * * section 5.1; page 11 * | [Y] - HEE YOUNG JUNG ET AL, "Fast Handover for Hierarchical MIPv6 (F-HMIPv6) | [A] - RAJEEV KOODLI ET AL, "Fast Handovers for Mobile IPv6; draft-ietf-mipshop-fast-mipv6-03.txt", 20041025, (20041025), vol. mipshop, no. 3, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015038627 [A] 1-21 * section 1. - section 3.2; pages 2-8 * | [A] - YOUNHEE HAN XIAOYU LIU HEEJIN JANG SAMSUNG AIT, "Upper Layer-driven Link Layer Action; draft-han-mopopts-uldriven-00.txt", 20040711, (20040711), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015014029 [A] 1-21 * section 2.1 - section 2.2; pages 3-5 * |