EP1873774 - INFORMATION RECORDING DEVICE AND METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR RECORD CONTROL, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAMIKI, Tsuyoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Sougou Kenyusho 1-2, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Masayoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Sougou Kenyusho 1-2, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 03 /
HASEBE, Tsuyoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Sougou Kenyusho 1-2, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Shinji c/o Pioneer Corporation Sougou Kenyusho 1-2, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi Saitama 350-2288 / JP | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
NAMIKI, Tsuyoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama; 3598522 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHIDA, Masayoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama; 3598522 / JP | |||
03 /
HASEBE, Tsuyoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama; 3598522 / JP | |||
04 /
SUZUKI, Shinji c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works. 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama; 3598522 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06731017.7 | 03.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006JP307069 | Priority number, date | JP20050107230 | 04.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005107230 | [2008/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006107033 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873774 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B7/0045, G11B7/007, G11B20/10 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G11B7/0045 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/322 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10861 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1227 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1265 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1285 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1288 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/08] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR AUFZEICHNUNGSSTEUERUNG UND INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2008/01] | English: | INFORMATION RECORDING DEVICE AND METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR RECORD CONTROL, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | [2008/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR COMMANDE D'ENREGISTREMENT ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2007 | Translation filed | 15.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | 17.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005030852 (SASAKI YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-11,13 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050] , [0058] , [0065] , [0070] , [0075] , [0076] , [0083] , [0084]; figures 1,2C,4D,6 * [Y] 7,12; | [X]WO2005020231 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9-11 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 4; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO2005004117 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [Y] - ECMA : STANDARDIZING INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, "80 mm (1,46 Gbytes per side) and 120 mm (4,70 Gbytes per side) DVD Re-recordable Disk (DVD-RW)", STANDARD ECMA,, (20021201), pages 1 - 148, XP002339283 [Y] 7,12 * page 80 - page 99 * |