EP1865040 - FABRIC PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sliontec Corporation 3819, Noborito, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214-0014 / JP | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAI, Eriko, Sliontec Corporation 3819, Noborito, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2140014 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Nobuyoshi, Sliontec Corporation 3819, Noborito, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2140014 / JP | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06731101.9 | 28.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP307153 | Priority number, date | JP20050100991 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005100991 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006107054 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865040 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, C09J107/00, C09J133/00, C09J201/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C09J107/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
C09J2400/263 (EP,US);
C09J2407/00 (EP,US);
C09J2423/006 (EP,US);
C09J2433/00 (EP,US);
C09J2467/006 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, NL [2008/18] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEXTILES HAFTKLEBEBAND | [2007/50] | English: | FABRIC PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE | [2007/50] | French: | BANDE ADHESIVE EN TISSU SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2007 | Translation filed | 04.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 01.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |