EP1873961 - CIRCUIT BUILDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUI, Shinichi, Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC, IP Dev.Center, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
MATSUZAKI, Natsume, Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC, IP Dev.Center, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NAKANO, Toshihisa, Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC, IP Dev.Center, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06731428.6 | 07.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006JP307481 | Priority number, date | JP20050110608 | 07.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005110608 | [2008/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006109738 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873961 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/14 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
H04L9/0891 (EP,US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSAUFBAUEINRICHTUNG | [2008/01] | English: | CIRCUIT BUILDING DEVICE | [2008/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONSTRUCTION DE CIRCUIT | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2007 | Translation filed | 05.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 16.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |