EP1865636 - RADIO RECEIVING APPARATUS AND RADIO RECEIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTA, Eiji Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
UESUGI, Mitsuru Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06731530.9 | 10.04.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP307583 | Priority number, date | JP20050119828 | 18.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005119828 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006115030 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865636 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04J13/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
H04L27/2647 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/719 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/71637 (KR);
H04L27/2623 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/30] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKEMPFÄNGERGERÄT UND - VERFAHREN | [2007/50] | English: | RADIO RECEIVING APPARATUS AND RADIO RECEIVING METHOD | [2007/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION RADIO ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION RADIO | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | Translation filed | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 30.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |