Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7632626 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2009 | B2 | US2008268379 | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005120697 | 19.04.2005 | WO2006JP307848 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101343075B | Global Dossier | 15.01.2014 | B1 | KR20080002971 | 04.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005120697 | 19.04.2005 | WO2006JP307848 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4840609B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2011 | B2 | JPWO2006115074 | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007514566 | 13.04.2006 | JP2005120697 | 19.04.2005 | WO2006JP307848 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1876495 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2011 | B1 | EP1876495 | 21.07.2010 | A4 | EP1876495 | 09.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005120697 | 19.04.2005 | WO2006JP307848 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101160549B | 10.10.2012 | B | CN101160549 | 09.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005120697 | 19.04.2005 | WO2006JP307848 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006115074 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005120697 | 19.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI371656B | 01.09.2012 | B | TW200702919 | 16.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005120697 | 19.04.2005 |