EP1874872 - DYE MATERIAL, DYE SOLUTION AND MULTIPHOTON ABSORPTION REACTION MATERIAL USING THE SAME, REACTION PRODUCT, MULTIPHOTON ABSORPTION REACTION MATERIAL, GOLD NANORODS AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF GOLD NANORODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKI, Takeshi Seta Village 205, 2-24-17, Okamoto, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 1570076 / JP | 02 /
MISAWA, Shigeyoshi 2-5-8, Denenchohu, Ohta-ku, Tokyo 1450071 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Tsutomu Queen Heights Okurayama 112 664, Morooka-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2220002 / JP | 04 /
TOMURA, Tatsuya 1-22-13-406, Honisshiki, Edogawa-ku, Tokyo 1330044 / JP | 05 /
TAKADA, Mikiko La Maju Aoba 201, 2-2-7, Azaminominami, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2250012 / JP | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06732490.5 | 26.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006JP309188 | Priority number, date | JP20050129342 | 27.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005129342 | JP20060039143 | 16.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006039143 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006118311 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874872 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/44, B22F1/00, B22F9/24, C09B23/00 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
B22F9/24 (EP,US);
B22F1/0545 (EP,US);
B22F1/0547 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09B23/148 (EP,US);
C09B67/0083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/32] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBSTOFFMATERIAL, FARBSTOFFLÖSUNG UND DAVON GEBRAUCH MACHENDES MULTIPHOTONABSORPTIONSREAKTIONSMATERIAL, REAKTIONSPRODUKT, MULTIPHOTONABSORPTIONSREAKTIONSMATERIAL, GOLDNANOSTÄBCHEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR GOLDNANOSTÄBCHEN | [2008/02] | English: | DYE MATERIAL, DYE SOLUTION AND MULTIPHOTON ABSORPTION REACTION MATERIAL USING THE SAME, REACTION PRODUCT, MULTIPHOTON ABSORPTION REACTION MATERIAL, GOLD NANORODS AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF GOLD NANORODS | [2008/02] | French: | MATERIAU COLORANT, BAIN COLORANT ET MATERIAU REACTIF D ABSORPTION MULTIPHOTON UTILISANT CELUI-CI, PRODUIT REACTIF, MATERIAU REACTIF D ABSORPTION MULTIPHOTON, NANOTIGES EN OR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DES NANOTIGES EN OR | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 01.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004079195 (PERRY JOSEPH W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraph [0041]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraphs [0111] - [0113] * * paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0194] * * paragraphs [0286] - [0287] * * paragraphs [0122] - [0126] * [I] 3,9-16; | [X]US2004150818 (ARMSTRONG ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] *; | [XI]JP2005097718 (NIITOME YASURO, et al) [X] 1,9,13,14 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0039] * [I] 10-12; | [XI] - YANG XUA ET AL, "Maximizing dye fluorescence via incorporation of metallic nanoparticles in solution", SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010 USA, (2004), XP040192682 [X] 1,5-8 * page 178 * [I] 3 | [A] - STUART D A ET AL, "Biological applications of localised surface plasmonic phenomenae", 20050201; 20050200, (20050201), vol. 152, no. 1, pages 13 - 32, XP006023676 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2004059279 |