EP2025452 - MACHINE TOOL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OKS Co., Ltd. 2-21-2, Adachi, Adachi-ku Tokyo, 120-0015 / JP | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKANDA, Satoshi OKS CO., LTD., 2-21-2, Adachi, Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-0015 / JP | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Köppen, Manfred, et al WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Köppen, Manfred, et al Weber Seiffert Lieke, Patentanwälte, Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06732540.7 | 12.05.2006 | [2009/08] | WO2006JP309559 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132506 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025452 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025452 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q7/00, B23Q1/66 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B23Q1/66 (EP,US);
B23Q1/0081 (EP,US);
B23Q7/1431 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5196 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, PL, PT [2009/29] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMASCHINENVORRICHTUNG | [2009/08] | English: | MACHINE TOOL APPARATUS | [2009/08] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2008 | Translation filed | 05.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 13.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PL | 06.07.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | [2012/11] |
Former [2012/09] | PT | 07.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4173817 (HEMPEL RAYMOND O JR [US], et al) [I] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0111368 (COMAU SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [I]WO9101196 (KITAMURA MACHINERY CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1* figure 1 *; | [I]US4999895 (HIROSE AKIRA [JP], et al) [I] 1 * figure 3 * |