EP1878289 - METHOD AND APPRATUS FOR RECONFIGURING A COMMON CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Young Dae 370-43, Deokpung 2-dong Hanam-si, Gyeonggi-do 465-804 / KR | 02 /
CHUN, Sung Duck 601-1007 Saetbyeol Hanyang Apt., Daran-dong Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-719 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Myung Cheul 2/2, 358-36 Sangdo 2-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-832 / KR | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06732891.4 | 02.05.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006KR01650 | Priority number, date | KR20050037757 | 04.05.2005 Original published format: KR 20050037757 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006118414 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1878289 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878289 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04L12/18 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
H04L12/189 (EP,US);
H04W76/19 (KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (KR);
H04W48/10 (KR);
H04W48/12 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | H04W4/06, H04B7/26 | ||
Former IPC [2008/03] | H04Q7/38, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMKONFIGURIEREN EINES GEMEINSAMEN KANALS | [2008/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPRATUS FOR RECONFIGURING A COMMON CHANNEL | [2008/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR RECONFIGURER UN CANAL COMMUN | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 29.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004017541 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]WO2005018116 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [E]WO2006104335 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) | International search | [X]US2003103478 (ERIKSSON GORAN [SE]); | [X]WO2005018116 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | by applicant | WO2005018116 | WO2006104335 |