EP1866607 - SENSOR FIBER STRAIN SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 20 Biopolis Way, No. 07-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Jun Hong, Institute for Infocomm Research 21 Heng Mui Keng Terrace 119613 / SG | 02 /
ZHOU, Xiaoqun, Institute for Infocomm Research 21 Heng Mui Keng Terrace 119613 / SG | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwalte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06733528.1 | 05.04.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006SG00085 | Priority number, date | US20050668466P | 05.04.2005 Original published format: US 668466 P | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006107277 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866607 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/353, G01D5/26, G01L1/24, G02B6/34, G02B6/02, G01M11/08 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
G02B6/02138 (EP,US);
G01D5/35303 (EP,US);
G01D5/35316 (EP);
G01D5/35354 (EP);
G01L1/246 (EP,US);
G01M11/086 (EP,US);
G02B6/022 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | G01D5/353, G01D5/26, G01L1/24, G02B6/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSOR FÜR EINEN FASERBELASTUNGSSENSOR | [2007/51] | English: | SENSOR FIBER STRAIN SENSOR | [2007/51] | French: | CAPTEUR DE CONTRAINTES A FIBRES DE CAPTEUR | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 18.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2000329627 ; | [A]GB2346965 (OXFORD FIBER OPTIC TOOLS LTD [GB]); | [Y]WO0246712 (UNIV NANYANG [SG], et al); | [X]WO03001262 (OPTICAL POWER SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004104539 (UNIV NANYANG [SG], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000329627 A 20001130 (FUJIKURA LTD) |