EP1851045 - ORNAMENTAL FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGASHIRA, Ken 33-1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya, Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Shinji 33-1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya, Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06733665.1 | 10.01.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US00821 | Priority number, date | JP20050004067 | 11.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005004067 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006088572 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1851045 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B44C1/10, B44C1/17 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B5/00 (EP,US);
B44C1/105 (EP,US);
B44C3/02 (KR);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMUCKFOLIEN | [2007/45] | English: | ORNAMENTAL FILMS | [2007/45] | French: | FILMS DECORATIFS | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5286528 (REAFLER GERALD G [US]) [Y] 1-21 * column 1, lines 12-17 - column 3, lines 47-65 * * column 4, lines 30-50 - column 6, lines 20-28 * * column 6, lines 56-63 - column 7, lines 3-61; figure 2 *; | [Y]US4550052 (MALEK WASFI N [DE]) [Y] 1-21 * column 1, lines 38-60 - column 2, lines 11-32; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]WO0029499 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 17, line 21 - page 18, line 4 *; | [Y]US4751121 (KUEHNEL WERNER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * column 3, lines 61-68 *; | [A]US3321349 (JEAN NIVIERE) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |