EP1841581 - COMPOSITES AND METHODS FOR THE MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southern Research Institute 2000 Ninth Avenue, South, P.O. Box 55305 Birmingham Alabama 35255-5305 / US | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Scott, C. 2058 Crosscrest Drive Birmingham, Alabama 35244-8299 / US | 02 /
CAIN, Andrew, W. 5633 5th Avenue S. Birmingham, Alabama 35212 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Randell, L. 125 Escambia Lane no. 305 Cocoa Beach, Florida FL 32932 / US | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
BROWN, Scott, C. 2058 Crosscrest Drive Birmingham, Alabama 35244-8299 / US | ||
02 /
CAIN, Andrew, W. 5633 5th Avenue S. Birmingham, Alabama 35212 / US | |||
03 /
THOMPSON, Randell, L. 5712 Serene Ridge Circle Mccalla, Alabama 35111 / US | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06733820.2 | 25.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006US02336 | Priority number, date | US20050647079P | 26.01.2005 Original published format: US 647079 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081203 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841581 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/00, B29C39/00, C04B38/00, C04B38/06, C04B35/524, C04B41/00, C04B41/83, C04B41/48 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
B29C39/003 (EP,US);
B01J13/0091 (EP,US);
C04B35/524 (EP,US);
C04B38/0032 (EP,US);
C04B38/0615 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/4823 (EP,US);
C04B41/83 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00982 (EP,US);
C04B2111/28 (EP,US);
C04B2235/48 (EP,US);
C04B2235/616 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0032, C04B35/524, C04B38/0045, C04B38/0067, C04B38/007 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/52, C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/4823, C04B41/4515, C04B41/457, C04B41/4582 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/52] | B32B9/00, C08J9/26 | ||
Former IPC [2007/41] | B29C39/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2007/41] | English: | COMPOSITES AND METHODS FOR THE MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF | [2007/41] | French: | COMPOSITES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 02.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2512441 (LORRAINE CARBONE [FR]) [A] 1-25* example 2 *; | [XI]WO9506002 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9,10,12-17,21 * example 4 * [I] 5,18; | [XDI]US5945084 (DROEGE MICHAEL W [US]) [XD] 1-4,9,10,16,17,19,21 * examples 3-6; table 1 * [I] 5; | [XYI]US2003134916 (HRUBESH LAWRENCE W [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9,16,17,19,21,22 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017]; claim 17; table 1 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 5,11,20,23-25; | [YA] - PEKALA R W, "ORGANIC AEROGELS FROM THE POLYCONDENSATION OF RESORCINOL WITH FORMALDEHYDE", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, NL, (19890101), vol. 24, doi:10.1007/BF01139044, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 3221 - 3227, XP009030940 [Y] 6-8 * Chapters 2.2. "Solvent exchange" and 2.3. "Critical point drying" * [A] 12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01139044 | International search | [Y]US5393619 (MAYER STEVEN T [US], et al); | [A]US6467731 (HARRIS EDWARD NATHAN [US], et al); | [A]US6770584 (BARNEY ANDREA O [US], et al) | Examination | WO9923049 | US6770584 | WO2005003476 |