|
08.05.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
99 |
|
21.11.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
10.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2019 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2019 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2019 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.12.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.12.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.01.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.01.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.10.2010 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.10.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
03.10.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
03.10.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
102 |